AZ HB2022 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Unlawful discharge of firearms; exception

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful discharge of firearms; exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-03-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-01HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0)
2017-01-31HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-01-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-05HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133107Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68443
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2022p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2022h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2022judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2022farnsworth e.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68443&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68443&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68443&billStatusActionId=174087&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68443&billStatusActionId=173963&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68443&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68443&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68443&billStatusActionId=176725&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68443&billStatusActionId=176879&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback