AZ HB2020 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sexual assault; harassment; confidentiality agreements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault; harassment; confidentiality agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19 Transmitted to Governor
2018-04-18HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-17HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-17HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-12HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-16SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse JPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-11-30HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12720New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69633
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2020p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2020h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2020s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2020syms.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2020judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2020floorfann.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69633&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69633&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69633&billStatusActionId=180876&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69633&billStatusActionId=180880&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69633&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69633&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69633&billStatusActionId=182543&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69633&billStatusActionId=183274&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69633&billStatusActionId=183319&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69633&billStatusActionId=183322&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback