AZ HB2019 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Community college bonds; voter approval

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community college bonds; voter approval

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2017-01-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-23HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-01-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-05HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151482Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151483Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback