AZ HB2019 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Chapter 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Continuation; funeral board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuation; funeral board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-15 Chapter 22
2014-04-15 Governor Signed
2014-04-09 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-08SenateTransmit to House
2014-04-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-3-3-0)
2014-04-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-03-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-02-18SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-26SenateSenate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
2014-02-19SenateReferred to Senate CEM Committee
2014-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2014-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate CEM Committee
2014-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-02-11HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-02-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0)
2014-02-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0)
2014-01-14HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-01-29HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0)
2014-01-15HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2014-01-15HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-01-14HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2014-01-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback