AZ HB2018 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - House MVRA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - House MVRA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; cultivation; facilities
Title
Medical marijuana; cultivation; facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | House MVRA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-11 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned to House MVRA Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |