AZ HB2016 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
JLBC; JCCR; reports.
Title
JLBC; JCCR; reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-07 | House final reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-1-0-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-03 | House third reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-27 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-01-25 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-25 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-24 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-19 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-12 | House read second time | |
2011-01-11 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced in House and read first time |