AZ HB2014 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 316
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Legal tender exchange; tax effect

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal tender exchange; tax effect

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 316
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-10HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-10SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2017-05-09SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2017-05-08SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (14-14-2-0)
2017-04-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-04-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-08SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-01HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-4-0-0)
2017-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-04HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431122Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68430
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2014p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2014h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0316.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68430&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68430&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68430&billStatusActionId=174662&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68430&billStatusActionId=174529&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68430&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68430&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68430&billStatusActionId=176943&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68430&billStatusActionId=177471&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68430&billStatusActionId=177533&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68430&billStatusActionId=177601&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback