AZ HB2012 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
County improvement districts; formation
Title
County improvement districts; formation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 92 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2022-02-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-12 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-12-07 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
County Improvement Districts
Elected Board (s)
Formation
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Verification (s)
Elected Board (s)
Formation
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Verification (s)