AZ HB2012 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Political parties; proxies
Title
Political parties; proxies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-11-27 | House | Prefile |