AZ HB2011 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Veterans; increased income tax subtraction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans; increased income tax subtraction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2019-03-11HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (25-35-0-0)
2019-03-11HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-12-20HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71017
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2011p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2011h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71017&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71017&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71017&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71017&billStatusActionId=187072&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71017&billStatusActionId=187467&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71017&billStatusActionId=188157&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71017&billStatusActionId=188158&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71017&billStatusActionId=188293&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback