AZ HB2011 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Cosmetology; licensing exceptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cosmetology; licensing exceptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-29HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-11-27HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32506Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback