AZ HB2006 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum age; marriage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum age; marriage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateChapter 173
2018-04-11SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0)
2018-04-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-15SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (51-7-2-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse JPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-11-20HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25122Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69618
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2006p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2006h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0173.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2006farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2006judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69618&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69618&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69618&billStatusActionId=181257&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69618&billStatusActionId=181287&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69618&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69618&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69618&billStatusActionId=182840&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69618&billStatusActionId=183008&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback