AZ HB2005 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Senate COM Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibitions; digital application distribution platforms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibitions; digital application distribution platforms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateSenate COM Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-15SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-11SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2021-03-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-16HouseHouse COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-12-16HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15209Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74279
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2005p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2005h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2005weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2005cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2005appropriations.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484237
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484889
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485446
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486332
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487729
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74279&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74279&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74279&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74279&billStatusActionId=202507&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74279&billStatusActionId=202508&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74279&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback