AZ HB2005 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public service corporations; penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public service corporations; penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateChapter 60
2018-03-23SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-22SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-22HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (34-24-2-0)
2018-03-22HouseHouse concurs
2018-03-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-03-22HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-03-21HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-1-1)
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-26-2-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-17HouseHouse LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House LIA Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-11-17HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9403.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69616
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2005p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2005h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2005s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0060.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2005borrelli.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.20050407jm.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2005345jm.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2005gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2005mendez0848.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69616&billStatusActionId=180586&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69616&billStatusActionId=180651&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69616&billStatusActionId=180653&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69616&billStatusActionId=182594&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69616&billStatusActionId=182608&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69616&billStatusActionId=182614&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69616&billStatusActionId=182620&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback