AZ HB2003 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Chapter 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Coal mining; TPT; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coal mining; TPT; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateChapter 263
2018-04-25SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-19HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-19SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0)
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-04-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-21SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-05HouseHouse third reading None voting: (33-22-5-0)
2018-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-11-15HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426113New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69612
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2003p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2003h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0263.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2003leach.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2003ways and means.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2003peshlakai103.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69612&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69612&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69612&billStatusActionId=181570&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69612&billStatusActionId=182204&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69612&billStatusActionId=182273&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69612&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69612&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69612&billStatusActionId=183314&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69612&billStatusActionId=183346&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback