AZ HB2003 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-10 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Marijuana; regulation; taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; regulation; taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-30 - House of Representatives - House - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-12-13HousePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback