AZ HB2003 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Chapter 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Fire sprinklers; permits; regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire sprinklers; permits; regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-02 Chapter 191
2015-04-02 Governor Signed
2015-03-30 Transmitted to Governor
2015-03-30HouseHouse final reading , voting: (52-8-0-0)
2015-03-30HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2015-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-24SenateTransmit to House
2015-03-24SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2015-03-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-03-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended
2015-02-17SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-25SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2015-02-18SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2015-02-18SenateSenate read second time
2015-02-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-17SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2015-02-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2015-02-16HouseTransmit to Senate
2015-02-16HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2015-02-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-02-10HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-10HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-09HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2015-01-29HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-02-04HouseHouse COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2015-02-02HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2015-02-02HouseHouse read second time
2015-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-01-29HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=114&Bill_Number=HB2003
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/laws/0191.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/h.2003 wp.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/h.2003-se-maps.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/s.2003rul.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/2003farnsworthd1000.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003.hcom.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003.sgov.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/hb2003.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback