AZ HB2003 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Watercraft; civil and criminal penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Watercraft; civil and criminal penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-22 Chapter 127
2014-04-22 Governor Signed
2014-04-16 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-16SenateTransmit to House
2014-04-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0)
2014-04-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-02SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-03-10SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-17SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0)
2014-03-11SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2014-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-03-05HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-03-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2014-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2014-01-14HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-20HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2014-02-18HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2014-02-18HouseHouse PSMRA Committee action: Withdrawn
2014-01-15HouseReferred to House PSMRA Committee
2014-01-15HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-02-18HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2014-01-14HouseAssigned to House PSMRA Committee
2014-01-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback