AZ HB2003 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency response services fees; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency response services fees; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-13 Governor Signed
2011-04-07 Transmitted to Governor
2011-04-07 House final reading , voting: (49-8-3-0)
2011-04-07 House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0)
2011-04-06 House minority caucus: Do pass
2011-04-06 Transmit to House
2011-04-05 Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0)
2011-03-24 Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2011-03-14 Senate Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 1:10 PM with Objections
2011-03-22 Senate majority caucus: Do pass
2011-03-22 Senate minority caucus: Do pass
2011-03-14 Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2011-03-01 Referred to Senate RULES Committee
2011-03-09 Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0)
2011-03-02 Referred to Senate PSHS Committee
2011-03-02 Senate read second time
2011-03-01 Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
2011-03-01 Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee
2011-03-01 Introduced in Senate and read first time
2011-02-28 Transmit to Senate
2011-02-28 House third reading , voting: (52-6-2-0)
2011-02-24 House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2011-02-22 House majority caucus: Do pass
2011-02-22 House minority caucus: Do pass
2011-02-21 House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2011-01-11 Referred to House RULES Committee
2011-02-10 House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2011-01-12 Referred to House TRANS Committee
2011-01-12 House read second time
2011-01-11 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2011-01-11 Assigned to House TRANS Committee
2011-01-11 Introduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback