AZ HB2002 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Student apprenticeship program; tax credits
Title
Student apprenticeship program; tax credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 249.16 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1075 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1163 | New Code | See Bill Text |