AZ HB2001 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Special

Note: Replaces legislation SB1001

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; fire suppression

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; fire suppression

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - Senate - Motion HB 2001 substituted for SB 1001. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House - Cano motion to amend COW report to show the Cano #2 flr am to bill pass - failed RCV (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Motion HB 2001 substituted for SB 1001. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18SenateChapter 1
2021-06-18SenateGovernor Signed
2021-06-17SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-17HouseTransmit to House
2021-06-17SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-2-4-0)
2021-06-17SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2001 substituted for SB 1001. Motion carried.
2021-06-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-06-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-06-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-2-2-0)
2021-06-17HouseHouse motion to amend
2021-06-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-06-17HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-06-17HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-06-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-06-16HouseHouse read second time
2021-06-16HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-06-15HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-06-15HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2021-06-15HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1001 (Replaces) 2021-06-17 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431089.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431181New CodeSee Bill Text
43222Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76198
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1s/bills/hb2001p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1s/bills/hb2001h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1s/laws/0001.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2001p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2001h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2001appropriations.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2001cobb.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490022
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490027
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490030
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490062
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484888
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485263
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486331
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489875
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488194
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489921
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489898
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76198&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76198&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76198&billStatusActionId=204324&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76198&billStatusActionId=204323&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76198&billStatusActionId=204326&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76198&billStatusActionId=204325&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76198&billStatusActionId=204327&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74275&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74275&billStatusActionId=204324&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74275&billStatusActionId=204326&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback