AZ HB2001 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxpayer voluntary contribution; fund
Title
Taxpayer voluntary contribution; fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (17-11-2-0) | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Consent Calendar April 14, 2010 @ 1:00 PM | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-2-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-23 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-23 | House third reading , voting: (44-13-3-0) | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-01-25 | House Consent Calendar January 25, 2010 @ 3:30 PM with Objections | |
2010-01-26 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-26 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-25 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-14 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-12 | House read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in House and read first time |