AR SR2 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Congratulate Victoria Alexandra Maloch For Her Election To The 2014-2015 National Ffa Officer Team As National Secretary And The First Female National Ffa Officer From Arkansas.
Title
To Congratulate Victoria Alexandra Maloch For Her Election To The 2014-2015 National Ffa Officer Team As National Secretary And The First Female National Ffa Officer From Arkansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR2 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SR2.pdf |