AR SR18 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Providing That The Senate Of The Ninetieth General Assembly Shall Stand In Recess Monday, March 23, 2015, Through Wednesday, March 25, 2015, And Reconvene On Thursday, March 26, 2015.
Title
Providing That The Senate Of The Ninetieth General Assembly Shall Stand In Recess Monday, March 23, 2015, Through Wednesday, March 25, 2015, And Reconvene On Thursday, March 26, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR18 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SR18.pdf |