AR SJR7 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Urging The United States Congress To Propose An Amendment To The United States Constitution Concerning The Definition Of "marriage".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The United States Congress To Propose An Amendment To The United States Constitution Concerning The Definition Of "marriage".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Read the third time and failed of Adoption (Y: 29 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - The motion to suspend the rules to consider SJR 7 FAILED. (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read third time and FAILED of adoption. (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateSine Die adjournment
2017-05-01SenateDied in House at Sine Die adjournment.
2017-03-30HouseRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-29HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-28HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2017-03-20HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-03-20HouseThe vote by which SJR7 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2017-03-14HouseRead the third time and failed of Adoption
2017-03-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-02-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-02-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-02-28SenateSounding of the BALLOT.
2017-02-28SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2017-02-22SenateThe motion to suspend the rules to consider SJR 7 FAILED.
2017-02-20SenateThe vote by which SJR 7 FAILED was EXPUNGED.
2017-02-20SenateRead third time and FAILED of adoption.
2017-02-16SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-09SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-02-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-09SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-09SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-02-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-02-02SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback