AR SCR8 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize The Magnolia High School Boys And Girls Swim And Dive Teams For Their Many Successes Throughout The Years And To Recognize The Magnolia Community For Its Support Of The Swim And Dive Teams.
Title
To Recognize The Magnolia High School Boys And Girls Swim And Dive Teams For Their Many Successes Throughout The Years And To Recognize The Magnolia Community For Its Support Of The Swim And Dive Teams.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Crowell [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2023-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned To Senate concurred in. |
2023-04-05 | House | Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2023-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=scr8&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSCR8.pdf |