AR SCR7 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Designate March 2023 As Rare Kidney Disease Awareness Month In Arkansas To Increase Public Awareness And Understanding Of The Genetic Causes Of Rare Kidney Disease.
Title
To Designate March 2023 As Rare Kidney Disease Awareness Month In Arkansas To Increase Public Awareness And Understanding Of The Genetic Causes Of Rare Kidney Disease.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2023-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned To Senate concurred in. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=scr7&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSCR7.pdf |