AR SCR7 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Bass Reeves And His Contributions To Law Enforcement.
Title
Recognizing Bass Reeves And His Contributions To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2017-03-22 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SCR7 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/SCR7.pdf |