AR SCR1 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting Establishment Of A Standard Of Identity For Rice Using The Common Understanding Of The Term “rice”.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting Establishment Of A Standard Of Identity For Rice Using The Common Understanding Of The Term “rice”.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2018-03-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2018-03-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2018-03-15SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2018-03-15HouseRead the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
2018-03-15HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2018-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2018-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
2018-03-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2018-03-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2018-03-14SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2018-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2018-03-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2018-03-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback