AR SB982 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Notification that SB982 is now Act 1010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Notification that SB982 is now Act 1010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Improve The Effectiveness Of The Juvenile Justice System; And To Provide Adequate Oversight Of Commitment Reduction Services.
Title
To Improve The Effectiveness Of The Juvenile Justice System; And To Provide Adequate Oversight Of Commitment Reduction Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Senate | Notification that SB982 is now Act 1010 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-23 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |