AR SB96 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Notification that SB96 is now Act 105
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Administrative Office Of The Courts Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Administrative Office Of The Courts Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-25SenateNotification that SB96 is now Act 105
2014-02-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2014-02-20SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2014-02-20SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2014-02-20SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2014-02-20HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2014-02-20HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-02-20HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-02-20HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2014-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2014-02-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2014-02-19SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2014-02-19SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-02-19SenateRules suspended.
2014-02-19SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-02-18SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2014-02-11SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2014-02-11SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2014-02-11SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-11SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2014-02-10SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2014-02-05SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback