AR SB943 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create A Study Of Electronic Prescribing.
Title
An Act To Create A Study Of Electronic Prescribing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned From the House as requested. | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned To the Senate as requested. | |
2011-03-16 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-16 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |