AR SB886 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish Accounting Measures For Fines, Costs, Fees, And Restitution Assessed By The Circuit Court In A Criminal Case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish Accounting Measures For Fines, Costs, Fees, And Restitution Assessed By The Circuit Court In A Criminal Case.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-04-22SenateDied on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-04-02SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2015-04-01SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2015-04-01SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2015-04-01HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2015-04-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-30HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-30HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-30HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2015-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-25SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-24SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-03-18SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
2015-03-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2015-03-18SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2015-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2015-03-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2015-03-09SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback