AR SB850 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That The Unemployment Stabilization Tax Shall Be Credited To The Separate Account Of Each Employer; And To Amend The Stabilization Tax Rates For The Unemployment Compensation Fund.
Title
To Require That The Unemployment Stabilization Tax Shall Be Credited To The Separate Account Of Each Employer; And To Amend The Stabilization Tax Rates For The Unemployment Compensation Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |