AR SB782 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB782 is now Act 1165
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB782 is now Act 1165
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That A Certain Amount Of Moneys In The Ad Valorem Tax Fund Be Used To Support The Assessment Coordination Department; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Require That A Certain Amount Of Moneys In The Ad Valorem Tax Fund Be Used To Support The Assessment Coordination Department; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Rep. Linck, K served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which SB782 Failed to Pass - 04/10/2013 02:17:58 PM (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Rep. Linck, K served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which SB782 Failed to Pass - 04/10/2013 02:17:58 PM (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | Senate | Notification that SB782 is now Act 1165 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-10 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-10 | House | Rep. Linck, K served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which SB782 Failed to Pass - 04/10/2013 02:17:58 PM |
2013-04-09 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed |