AR SB78 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Notification that SB78 is now Act 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Notification that SB78 is now Act 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish Arkansas Occupational Licensing Of Uniformed Service Members, Veterans, And Spouses Act Of 2021; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Establish Arkansas Occupational Licensing Of Uniformed Service Members, Veterans, And Spouses Act Of 2021; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Hill [R] | Rep. Roger Lynch [R] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Rep. Karilyn Brown [R] |
Rep. Brian Evans [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] | Sen. Trent Garner [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] | Sen. Jane English [R] | Sen. Scott Flippo [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Notification that SB78 is now Act 135 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-10 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-10 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed |