AR SB752 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that SB752 is now Act 696
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that SB752 is now Act 696
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify For Parents The Public School Rating System On Annual School Report Cards.
Title
To Clarify For Parents The Public School Rating System On Annual School Report Cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] | Rep. Debra Hobbs [R] | Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Sen. Bruce Holland [R] |
Sen. Johnny Key [R] | Sen. Jason Rapert [R] | Sen. Stephanie Flowers [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Notification that SB752 is now Act 696 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |