AR SB747 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Workers' Compensation Coverage Required For A Contractor.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Workers' Compensation Coverage Required For A Contractor.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |