AR SB739 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide Employee Exemptions From Federal Mandates And Employer Mandates Related To Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide Employee Exemptions From Federal Mandates And Employer Mandates Related To Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Motion to Expunge the Failed Emergency Clause. Voice vote taken and the motion failed. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Second Roll call on the Emergency Clause. The Emergency Clause Failed of Adoption. (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-10-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-10-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-10-06SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-10-06HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-10-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-10-06HouseMotion to take SB739 off the table passed
2021-10-06HouseMotion to postpone vote temporarily passed
2021-10-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-10-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-10-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-10-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House as passed with the Emergency Clause having failed of adoption.
2021-10-04SenateMotion to Expunge the vote by which the Emergency Clause failed to pass failed.
2021-10-04SenateMotion to Expunge the Failed Emergency Clause. Voice vote taken and the motion failed. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen.
2021-10-04SenateSecond Roll call on the Emergency Clause. The Emergency Clause Failed of Adoption.
2021-10-04SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote by which the Emergency Clause failed to pass. Motion carried.
2021-10-04SenateEmergency Clause Failed of Adoption
2021-10-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-10-04SenateRules suspended.
2021-10-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-10-04SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-10-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-10-04SenateAmendments 1 and 2 withdrawn
2021-10-01SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2021-09-30SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-09-29SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-09-29SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-09-29SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb739&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB739/SB739092920211051.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB739/SB739100420210936.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1115.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB739-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB739-S2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB739-S3.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/SB739-DFA1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB739&rcs=3222&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB739&rcs=3223&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB739&rcs=3224&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB739&rcs=3198&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback