AR SB719 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Voter Integrity Unit With The Secretary Of State; To Ensure Effective And Thorough Investigations Of Alleged Election Misconduct; And To Protect The Integrity Of Elections.
Title
To Create The Voter Integrity Unit With The Secretary Of State; To Ensure Effective And Thorough Investigations Of Alleged Election Misconduct; And To Protect The Integrity Of Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Returned to the Senate having been VETOED by the Governor |
2013-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-04-11 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |