AR SB66 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Notification that SB66 is now Act 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Notification that SB66 is now Act 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow The Tuition-free Benefit For Soldiers And Airmen Of The Arkansas National Guard To Apply To Programs Of Study In Which The Courses Are Taken Exclusively Online.
Title
To Allow The Tuition-free Benefit For Soldiers And Airmen Of The Arkansas National Guard To Apply To Programs Of Study In Which The Courses Are Taken Exclusively Online.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Notification that SB66 is now Act 133 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-10 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Filed |