AR SB659 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Northeast Arkansas Economic Development District, Inc.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Northeast Arkansas Economic Development District, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The vote by which SB659 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB659 failed to pass. Motion passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Filed |