AR SB636 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Subject Certain Contracts Of The Arkansas Department Of Transportation To The Arkansas Procurement Law.
Title
To Subject Certain Contracts Of The Arkansas Department Of Transportation To The Arkansas Procurement Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb636&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB636/SB636040520211745.pdf |