AR SB633 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Notification that SB633 is now Act 1289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Notification that SB633 is now Act 1289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide That The Five-dollar Fee For Taking The Driver’s License Examination Applies To All Driver's License Examination Tests Taken.
Title
To Provide That The Five-dollar Fee For Taking The Driver’s License Examination Applies To All Driver's License Examination Tests Taken.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Sample [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Notification that SB633 is now Act 1289 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-03-24 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |