AR SB611 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Acuity-based Care Committee; And To Recommend Protocols And Procedures To Create Standardization And Consistency In Nurse Staffing Within Hospitals And Rehabilitation And Long-term Care Facilities.
Title
To Create The Acuity-based Care Committee; And To Recommend Protocols And Procedures To Create Standardization And Consistency In Nurse Staffing Within Hospitals And Rehabilitation And Long-term Care Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee that it Do Pass, as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed |