AR SB6 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Notification that SB6 is now Act 308
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Unborn Child Protection Act; To Abolish Abortion In Arkansas And Protect The Lives Of Unborn Children; And To Protect All Human Life.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Unborn Child Protection Act; To Abolish Abortion In Arkansas And Protect The Lives Of Unborn Children; And To Protect All Human Life.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateNotification that SB6 is now Act 308
2021-03-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-03-04SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-03-03SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-03-03SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-03-03HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-03-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-22HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-02-22SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-02-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-02-22SenateThe vote by which SB6 Passed was expunged.
2021-02-22SenateMotion to Expunge the vote by which Senate Bill 6 passed.
2021-02-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-02-10SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-02-09SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-09SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-09SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2021-02-08SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-08SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-08SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2021-01-21SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-21SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-21SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-01-21SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-01-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2020-11-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb6&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB6/SB6111820201417.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB6/SB6020820210947.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB6/SB6020920210911.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=309.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB6-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB6-S2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB6-S3.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB6-S4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB6&rcs=1971&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB6&rcs=1972&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB6&rcs=2212&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback