AR SB6 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8-1)
Status: Passed on February 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-09 - Notification that SB6 is now Act 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8-1)
Status: Passed on February 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-09 - Notification that SB6 is now Act 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Middle Class Tax Relief Act Of 2015; To Amend The Income Tax Rates And Brackets For Individuals, Trusts, And Estates; To Amend The Income Tax On Capital Gains; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Create The Middle Class Tax Relief Act Of 2015; To Amend The Income Tax Rates And Brackets For Individuals, Trusts, And Estates; To Amend The Income Tax On Capital Gains; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Motion to suspend the rules passed. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Motion to recall SB 6 from the House, FAILED to pass. (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Motion to suspend the rules passed. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Motion to recall SB 6 from the House, FAILED to pass. (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | Senate | Notification that SB6 is now Act 22 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-05 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2015-01-29 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-01-29 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-01-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-01-29 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2015-01-29 | House | Motion to suspend the rules passed. |
2015-01-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-27 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Motion to recall SB 6 from the House, FAILED to pass. |
2015-01-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2015-01-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 withdrawn. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee, placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Filed |