AR SB571 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For An Individual Income Tax Reduction; To Provide Funding For The Income Tax Reduction Through A Tax On E-cigarettes; And To Create The Cigarette Tax And Income Tax Reform Study.
Title
To Provide For An Individual Income Tax Reduction; To Provide Funding For The Income Tax Reduction Through A Tax On E-cigarettes; And To Create The Cigarette Tax And Income Tax Reform Study.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2019-03-29 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-29 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Upon Sounding of the Ballot, SB571 passes |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Sounding of the Ballot |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Filed |