AR SB568 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB568 is now Act 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB568 is now Act 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Acts 2023, No. 237; And To Amend The Limitation On The Funds A Participating Student May Receive Under The Arkansas Children's Educational Freedom Account Program.
Title
To Amend Acts 2023, No. 237; And To Amend The Limitation On The Funds A Participating Student May Receive Under The Arkansas Children's Educational Freedom Account Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R] | Rep. Sonia Eubanks Barker [R] | Rep. Keith Brooks [R] | Sen. Breanne Davis [R] |
Sen. Ben Gilmore [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB568 is now Act 669 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Filed |