AR SB548 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB548 is now Act 932
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB548 is now Act 932
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Procedure For The Incorporation Of Municipalities.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Procedure For The Incorporation Of Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Notification that SB548 is now Act 932 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The vote by which SB548 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed |